IL HB0107 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that each election authority operating in a county organized by township shall operate one grace period voter registration site within each township under the jurisdiction of the election authority. Provides that each election authority operating in a county organized by precinct shall operate one grace period voter registration site within each precinct under the jurisdiction of the election authority. Provides that the Board of Election Commissioners for the City of Chicago shall operate one grace period voter registration site within each former township located within the City of Chicago, as those townships existed immediately prior to the date those townships were eliminated within the City of Chicago.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-GRACE PERIOD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-03-06HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-12.5New CodeSee Bill Text
1054-50Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-50Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-100Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback