IL HB0106 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that the holder of a master's degree in public administration who completes an additional 6 semester hours of internship in school business management from a regionally accredited institution of higher education and passes applicable State tests is eligible for a chief school business official endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations. Requires the State Board of Education to adopt any rules necessary to implement the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CHIEF SCHOOL BUSINESS OFFICIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0288 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |