IL HB0106 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that the holder of a master's degree in public administration who completes an additional 6 semester hours of internship in school business management from a regionally accredited institution of higher education and passes applicable State tests is eligible for a chief school business official endorsement. Requires the State Board of Education to adopt any rules necessary to implement the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD- SCH BUSINESS OFFICIAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback