IL HB0096 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-10HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback