IL HB0088 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that consumer debt judgments of $25,000 or less shall draw interest from the date of the judgment until satisfied at the rate of 5% per annum. Provides that when a consumer debt judgment is entered upon any award, report, or verdict, interest shall be computed at the applicable rate from the time when made or rendered to the time of entering judgment upon the same, and included in the judgment. Provides that interest shall be computed and charged only on the unsatisfied portion of the consumer debt judgment as it exists from time to time. Provides that the judgment debtor may stop the further accrual of interest on the consumer debt judgment. Provides that the provisions concerning interest on consumer debt judgments apply to all consumer debt judgments entered into after the effective date of the Act. Provides that a consumer debt judgment may be revived by filing a petition to revive the consumer debt judgment no later than 10 years after its entry and by serving the petition and entering a court order for revival. Provides that if a judgment or consumer debt judgment becomes dormant during the pendency of an enforcement proceeding against wages under specified Articles, the enforcement may continue to conclusion if the enforcement is done under court supervision and includes a wage deduction order or turn over order and is against an employer, garnishee, or other third party respondent. Makes a corresponding change. Effective immediately.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0168 |
2019-07-29 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 1-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |