IL HB0086 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Court of Claims Act. Deletes language regarding the amount a court shall award to a person for time unjustly served in prison when the person imprisoned received a pardon on the ground of innocence of the crime for which he or she was imprisoned or he or she received a certificate of innocence. Provides instead that the court shall award $50,000 per year during which the person was wrongfully imprisoned and shall prorate that amount for a fraction of a year that the person was wrongfully imprisoned, including the number of years the person was awaiting trial. Provides that the court shall award attorney's fees in an amount not to exceed 25% of the award granted. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to all claims pending or filed on or after the effective date.
Title
CRT CLAIMS-UNJUST IMPRISONMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |