IL HB0082 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2021-2022 school year, the State Board of Education shall develop and maintain a program aimed at facilitating education in advanced manufacturing technical skills. Provides that the program shall be implemented in no less than 12 public high schools, over the span of 3 years, where the youth unemployment rate is at least twice the national average. Specifies program requirements. Provides that the State Board shall ensure that each high school participating in the program has adequate funding for at least one industry coordinator, tutoring, pre-employment and on-the-job mentoring, professional and leadership development, and life and financial management instruction. Provides that the State Board shall use a program provider to help design, build, and accredit the training program. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-TECHNICAL SKILLS PROGRM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-006-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |