IL HB0082 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Creates the Lottery Supports Schools Fund. Provides that certain lottery revenues shall be deposited into the Fund. Provides that moneys in the fund shall be distributed to school districts based on the district's percentage of lottery sales. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-02-20 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |