IL HB0082 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the court may not commit to the Department of Juvenile Justice a delinquent who has been adjudged a ward of the court for an act that if committed by an adult would be a misdemeanor. Provides that if a minor has been adjudged a ward of the court for an act that if committed by an adult would be a Class 4 or Class 3 felony, the court shall, in addition to the factors and review in the Act, evaluate whether the best interests of the minor and the public will be served by placing the minor in a community based alternative program instead of commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Title
JUV CT-CONFINEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=82&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0082.htm |