IL HB0080 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Sets forth a list of nonfiction, fiction, and children's books about racism that shall be required reading for students in every public elementary and secondary school beginning with the 2021-2022 school year. Requires that the instruction in the material presented by each book be age appropriate and taught at the appropriate grade level. Effectively immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-K-12 BOOKS ABOUT RACISM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-23.15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback