IL HB0075 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that for the purposes of calculating paid sick leave for the birth of a child or the adoption or placement for adoption of a child, the days do not have to be taken immediately after the birth of the child or the adoption or placement of the child, the days do not have to be taken consecutively, and the school board may not count any day in which school is not in session, including an extended break.
Title
SCH CD-PAID SICK LEAVE-CHILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 077-033-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-011-000 |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |