IL HB0072 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Energy Assistance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning eligibility for and participation in the energy assistance program.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 20 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |