IL HB0068 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning notices of cancellation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 012-007-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-21HouseRe-assigned to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155143.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback