IL HB0066 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Route 66 Centennial Commission Act. Sets forth the appointment of the members, duties, and meeting requirements of the Commission. Provides that the Commission shall plan and sponsor Route 66 centennial events, programs, and activities and shall encourage the development of programs to involve all citizens in Route 66 centennial events. Requires the Commission to deliver a final report of its activities to the Governor no later than June 30, 2027. Provides that the Commission shall be dissolved on June 30, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROUTE 66 CENTENNIAL COMMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-02-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback