IL HB0057 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Agriculture for its FY20 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DEPT AGRIC-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Capital Committee
2019-03-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback