IL HB0054 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if an offender defaults in the payment of a fine or any installment of that fine, the court may issue a summons for his or her appearance (deletes warrant of arrest). Provides that the court may issue a warrant of arrest, if after being served with a summons, the offender fails to appear for the scheduled hearing.
Title
CD CORR-FINES-DEFAULT-WARRANT
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-07 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-9-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |