IL HB0053 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Artificial Intelligence Video Interview Act. Provides that employers that rely solely upon artificial intelligence to determine whether an applicant will qualify for an in-person interview must gather and report certain demographic information to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Requires the Department to analyze the data and report to the Governor and General Assembly whether the data discloses a racial bias in the use of artificial intelligence.
Title
VIDEO INTERVIEW DEMOGRAPHIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0047 |
2021-07-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-011-000 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-005-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |