IL HB0050 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in a Section regarding the short title of the Article concerning mortgage foreclosures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735515-1101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback