IL HB0047 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces fees payable to the Secretary of State and the Illinois Supreme Court by 50%. Applies to registration fees, copy fees, expedited service fees, and attorney certificate of registration fees.
Title
LLC ACT-REDUCE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-04 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 45-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0047.htm |