IL HB0043 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Provides that any person may report information about the suspicious death of an eligible adult to an agency designated to receive such reports under the Act or to the Department on Aging. Provides that if a mandated reporter has reason to believe that the death of an eligible adult may be the result of abuse or neglect, the matter shall be reported to an agency designated to receive such reports under the Act or to the Department for subsequent referral to the appropriate law enforcement agency and the coroner or medical examiner. Prohibits an employer from discriminating against any employee who reports information about the suspicious death of an eligible adult in accordance with the Act. Provides that any mandated reporter who is required under the Act to report a suspicious death due to abuse, neglect, or financial exploitation shall testify fully in any administrative hearing resulting from such report. Provides that a referral to law enforcement may be made after a report of a suspicious death, depending upon the circumstances. Provides that all records concerning reports of suspicious deaths due to abuse, neglect, financial exploitation, or self-neglect and all records generated as a result of such reports shall be confidential and shall not be disclosed, with some exceptions. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
AGING-SUSPICIOUS DEATH REPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=43&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0043.htm |