IL HB0040 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Disclosure Act. Provides that a seller of residential property to which the Act applies shall have the sewer line from the residential property to the sewer main, or in the case of a septic system to the septic tank, inspected by a licensed plumber using video camera inspection technology, and that the licensed plumber shall prepare a written, dated report that includes his or her review of the condition of the line. Provides that the seller shall attach the report to the residential real property disclosure report form required under the Act.
Title
REAL EST DISCLOSURE-SEWER LINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Re-assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2008-12-30 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=40&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0040.htm |