IL HB0038 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is an aggravating factor in sentencing for first degree murder that the murdered individual was a member of a congregation engaged in prayer or other religious activities at a church, synagogue, mosque, or other building, structure, or place used for religious worship. Provides that assault and battery committed in a church, synagogue, mosque, or other building, structure, or place used for religious worship are enhanced to aggravated assault or aggravated battery. Provides that the penalty for aggravated assault under this provision is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that aggravated battery under this provision is a Class 1 felony when the person causes great bodily harm or permanent disability to an individual whom the person knows to be a member of a congregation engaged in prayer or other religious activities at a church, synagogue, mosque, or other building, structure, or place used for religious worship. Provides that a person also commits the offense of unlawful use of weapons when the person knowingly carries or possesses with intent to use the same unlawfully against another, any firearm, knife, or other dangerous weapon, in any school church, synagogue, mosque, or other building, structure, or place used for religious worship. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony. Makes technical changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-PLACE OF WORSHIP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback