IL HB0036 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning mob action. Provides that a student of a public, private, or parochial elementary or secondary school shall be exempt from prosecution for mob action if the event occurred on the grounds of that public, private, or parochial elementary or secondary school during regular school hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-MOB ACTION-SCHOOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720525-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback