IL HB0032 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Illinois Act on the Aging concerning home-delivered meal services to Illinois residents who qualify under the federal Older Americans Act. Provides that, on an annual basis, each recipient of home-delivered meals shall receive a fact sheet developed by the Department on Aging with a current list of toll-free numbers to access information on various health conditions, elder abuse, and programs for persons 60 years of age and older. Provides that the fact sheet shall be written in a language that the client understands, if possible. Provides that each recipient of home-delivered meals shall receive updates on any new program for which persons 60 years of age and older may be eligible. Effective immediately.
Title
MEALS ON WHEELS-INFO PACKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0253 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Healthcare Access and Availability; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |