IL HB0029 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of parental bullying. Provides that a parent or legal guardian of a minor commits parental bullying when he or she knowingly and with the intent to discipline, embarrass, or alter the behavior of the minor, transmits any verbal or visual message that the parent or legal guardian reasonably believes would coerce, intimidate, harass, or cause substantial emotional distress to the minor. Provides that parental bullying is a petty offense. Provides that if a person is convicted of parental bullying, the court shall order that person to pay for the costs of prosecution and that a portion of any fine imposed, as determined by the court, be placed in escrow for the purchase of a certificate of deposit for use by the victim when he or she attains 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-PARENTAL BULLYING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2022-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512C-75New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback