IL HB0026 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Public University Uniform Admission Act. Requires each public university in this State to admit first-time freshman applicants as undergraduate students if the applicant graduated with a grade point average in the top 10% or was certified to be in the top 10% of the student's high school graduating class in one of the 2 school years preceding the academic year for which the applicant is applying for admission and (1) the applicant graduated from an accredited public or private high school in this State or from a high school operated by the United States Department of Defense; (2) the applicant successfully completed the minimum college preparatory curriculum requirements for admission to the university and satisfied the ACT college admission assessment or the SAT college admission assessment composite score and subscores required for admission to the university; and (3) if the applicant graduated from a high school operated by the United States Department of Defense, the applicant is a State resident or is entitled to pay tuition fees at the rate provided for State residents. Provides that the University of Illinois at Urbana-Champaign is not required to offer admission to applicants who qualify for automatic admission in excess of the number required to fill 75% of the university's enrollment capacity designated for first-time resident undergraduate students in an academic year. Sets forth other provisions concerning the University of Illinois at Urbana-Champaign. Sets forth other provisions concerning admissions. Provides for additional preparation for college, student outreach, and rulemaking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-UNIFORM ADMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. André Thapedi
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 013-000-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2019-05-14SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-14SenateRe-assigned to Higher Education
2019-05-14SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback