IL HB0024 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Not-For-Profit Organization Minority Employee Assistance Act. Defines terms. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish and administer the Not-For-Profit Organization Minority Employee Loan Repayment Assistance Program for the primary purpose of providing loan repayment assistance to minority employees to encourage minorities to pursue careers with not-for-profit organizations; provides for the Program's eligibility requirements. Provides that the maximum amount of loan repayment assistance for each Program participant shall be $5,000 per year, up to a maximum of $25,000 during the participant's career; provides for the manner of fund distribution. Provides that if a Program participant becomes ineligible during the term of a loan, he or she must repay the outstanding amount of any loan received from the Commission. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Not-For-Profit Organization Minority Employee Loan Repayment Assistance Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.
Title
HGHR ED-LOAN REPAY-MINORITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-22 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee (HED) |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=24&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0024.htm |