IL HB0019 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-03HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-08HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback