IL HB0018 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Requires a school district to implement (rather than establish) an informal teacher observation plan (rather than an informal teacher evaluation plan); makes related changes. In provisions concerning the Performance Evaluation Advisory Council, provides that the Council shall meet until June 30, 2024 (instead of June 30, 2021). Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code to provide that no later than September 1, 2022, the school district must establish a teacher evaluation plan that ensures that each teacher in contractual continued service whose performance is rated as either "excellent" or "proficient" is evaluated at least once in the course of the 3 school years after receipt of the rating and establish an informal teacher observation plan that ensures that each teacher in contractual continued service whose performance is rated as either "excellent" or "proficient" is informally observed at least once in the course of the 2 school years after receipt of the rating.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER EVALUATION
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0252 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |