IL HB0007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires services provided by community midwives, doulas, and breastfeeding peer counselors to be covered and reimbursed under the medical assistance program for persons who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-DOULA-MIDWIFE SERVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=7&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0007.htm |