IL HB0006 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish women's health clinics throughout the State to provide affordable health care for women. Requires the services provided at the women's health clinic to be offered at an affordable price and to include specified services, including women's health examinations, pregnancy confirmation, prenatal care, labor and delivery services, postpartum care, family planning examinations and birth control services, and care for sexually transmitted diseases and infections.
Title
IDPH-WOMEN'S HEALTH CLINICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2020-02-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2019-04-11 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-03 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-04-02 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-04-02 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2019-04-01 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-03-29 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-03-29 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-29 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2019-03-29 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-19 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-001-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |