IL HB0005 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to ensure access to substance use and mental health services statewide for pregnant and postpartum women, and to ensure that programs are gender-responsive, are trauma-informed, serve women and young children, and prioritize justice-involved pregnant and postpartum women. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish a classification system for specified levels of maternal care. Requires the Department to implement substantive measures that benefit maternal care and provide a greater amount of available information in order to further medical research. Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to ensure that EMS systems are transporting pregnant women to the appropriate facilities based on the Department of Public Health's classification system for levels of maternal care. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MATERNAL CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0447
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-001
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-19HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-001-000
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20130510-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2023102310-223New CodeSee Bill Text
210503.20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback