IL HB0003 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Hearing: May 21 @ 2:00 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Hospital Report Card Act to require that each hospital include in its quarterly report instances of preterm infants, infant mortality, and maternal mortality. Requires the reporting of racial and ethnic information of the infants' mothers, along with the disparity of occurrences across different racial and ethnic groups. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOSPITAL REPORT CARD ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2019-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-19HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2108625Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback