IL HB0002 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Patient Rights Act. Provides that every woman has certain rights with regard to pregnancy and childbirth, including the right to receive care that is consistent with current scientific evidence about benefits and risks, the right to choose her birth setting, the right to be provided with certain information, and the right to be treated with respect at all times before, during, and after pregnancy by her health care professionals and to have a health care professional that is culturally competent and treats her appropriately regardless of her ethnicity, sexual orientation, or religious background. Requires the Department of Public Health, Department of Healthcare and Family Services, Department of Children and Family Services, and Department of Human Services to post information about these rights on their publicly available websites. Requires every health care provider, day care center, Head Start, and community center to post information about these rights in a prominent place and on their websites, if applicable. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt rules to implement the provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH RIGHTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Public Health; 010-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-035-001
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-03HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-02HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-02-27HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-001-000
2019-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410503.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback