IL HB0001 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illiana Task Force Act. Creates the Illiana Task Force, consisting of 24 police officers, appointed by the Director of the Illinois State Police. Provides that the members of the Task Force shall select a chairperson. Provides that members of the Task Force shall receive no compensation for their service on the Task Force but shall be reimbursed for necessary expenses incurred in the performance of their duties from appropriations made by the General Assembly for that purpose. Provides that the Task Force shall meet at least once monthly to study ways to reduce violence in local communities caused by the illegal use of firearms and to make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on suggested legislative solutions to this problem. Provides that the Task Force shall submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year and a final report 5 years after the creation of the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall be dissolved 6 years after its creation. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2027. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLIANA TSK FORCE-FIREARM VIOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback