IL HB0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0038
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0038
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Infant and Maternal Mortality Among African Americans Act. Creates the Task Force on Infant and Maternal Mortality Among African Americans. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Provides for the election of a chairperson of the Task Force. Requires the Department of Public Health to provide technical support and assistance to the Task Force and to be responsible for administering its operations and ensuring that the requirements of the Act are met. Provides that members of the Task Force shall receive no compensation for their services as members of the Task Force. Provides for the meetings and duties of the Task Force. Provides that beginning December 1, 2020, and for each year thereafter, the Task Force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly. Provides findings. Effective immediately.
Title
INFANT & MATERNAL MORTALITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0038 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |