ID SP101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MARQUEE RICKS -- Commends Marquee Ricks for her accomplishment during the 2021 American Farm Bureau Federation's national Young Farmers and Ranchers Discussion Meet competition.
Title
Commends Marquee Ricks for her accomplishment during the 2021 American Farm Bureau Federation's national Young Farmers and Ranchers Discussion Meet competition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |