ID SP101 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Returned from House Adopted; Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SENATOR BART M. DAVIS -- A proclamation honoring and commending Bart M. Davis for his years of service to the Legislature of the State of Idaho and for his leadership, sound judgment and integrity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A proclamation honoring and commending Bart M. Davis for his years of service to the Legislature of the State of Idaho and for his leadership, sound judgment and integrity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14SenateReturned from House Adopted; Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
2018-02-13Houseto Senate
2018-02-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, February 13, 2018
2018-02-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-07HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-06Senateto House
2018-02-06SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-06SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 31-0-4
2018-02-05SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-02SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback