ID SJR106 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-28 - to Res/Con
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-28 - to Res/Con
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a new section to the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that the rights to hunt, fish and trap are a valued part of the heritage of the State of Idaho and shall forever be preserved for the people and managed through the laws, rules and proclamations of the state; and to provide that the rights set forth do not create a right to trespass on private property, shall not affect rights to divert, appropriate and use water, or establish any minimum amount of water in any water body, and shall not lead to a diminution of other private rights.
Title
Proposing a new section to the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that the rights to hunt, fish and trap are a valued part of the heritage of the State of Idaho and shall forever be preserved for the people and managed through the laws, rules and proclamations of the state; and to provide that the rights set forth do not create a right to trespass on private property, shall not affect rights to divert, appropriate and use water, or establish any minimum amount of water in any water body, and shall not lead to a diminution of other private rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | to Res/Con | |
2012-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-28 | House intro | |
2012-02-27 | to House | |
2012-02-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-27 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 34-0-0 | |
2012-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-21 | to Res/Env | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-20 | to printing | |
2012-02-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-20 | Senate intro |