ID SJR103 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RIGHTS OF CRIME VICTIMS -- Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho, regarding rights of crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho, regarding rights of crime victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2017-03-16HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-03-15Senateto House
2017-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-15SenateRead third time in full -- ADOPTED 34-0-1
2017-03-15SenateRetained on calendar
2017-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-07SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2017-03-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback