ID SJR103 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Senate and proposing an amendment to Section 1, Article XIV, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that all able-bodied persons, residents of this state, ages eighteen years or older be subject to military duty.
Title
Stating findings of the Senate and proposing an amendment to Section 1, Article XIV, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that all able-bodied persons, residents of this state, ages eighteen years or older be subject to military duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ret'd to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | FAILED -- 33-37-0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | to House |
2014-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | House | Rice |
2014-03-11 | House | 34-1-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bock Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-11 | House | ADOPTED |
2014-03-11 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2014-03-11 | House | Held for reconsideration |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |