ID SJR102 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATURE -- States findings of the Legislature and proposes an amendment to the Constitution of the state of Idaho to establish provisions regarding convening the Legislature for special or organizational sessions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

States findings of the Legislature and proposes an amendment to the Constitution of the state of Idaho to establish provisions regarding convening the Legislature for special or organizational sessions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2021-04-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-04-21SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-04-20Houseto Senate
2021-04-20HouseTitle apvd
2021-04-20HousePreviously Read in Full -- ADOPTED 54-15-1
2021-04-20HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-04-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-04-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-04-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-03-04HouseReceived from the Senate, Held at Desk
2021-03-03Senateto House
2021-03-03SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-03SenateRead third time in full -- ADOPTED 24-11-0
2021-03-02SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-03-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-26SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-26SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback