ID SJM106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WATER RIGHTS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the President and Congress to require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to recognize valid easements existing pursuant to the 1866 Mining Act on federal lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the President and Congress to require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to recognize valid easements existing pursuant to the 1866 Mining Act on federal lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2019-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-26SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-25Houseto Senate
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 50-13-7
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-13Senateto House
2019-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-13SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-13SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-13SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-12SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback