ID SJM104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JOINT MEMORIAL -- Requesting Congress and USDOT and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to grant exemption to agricultural commodity transporters from electronic log book requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Congress and USDOT and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to grant exemption to agricultural commodity transporters from electronic log book requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-16Houseto Senate
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 1 Abs/Excd 2, read in full as required -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-06HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-03-06HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-05Senateto House
2018-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-05SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Transportation
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback