ID SJM104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT MEMORIAL -- Requesting Congress and USDOT and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to grant exemption to agricultural commodity transporters from electronic log book requirements.
Title
Requesting Congress and USDOT and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to grant exemption to agricultural commodity transporters from electronic log book requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2018-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 1 Abs/Excd 2, read in full as required -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/SJM104/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/SJM104.pdf |