ID SJM103 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NATIONAL MONUMENTS AND WILDERNESS DESIGNATIONS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and stating opposition to any new federal national monument designations, or further designations of wilderness, in the State of Idaho without the approval of the United States Congress and the Idaho Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and stating opposition to any new federal national monument designations, or further designations of wilderness, in the State of Idaho without the approval of the United States Congress and the Idaho Legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-13Senateto House
2018-02-13SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-13SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-09SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback