ID SJM101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WATER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the President and Congress to take such action as necessary to require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to recognize valid easements existing pursuant to the 1866 Mining Act on federal lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the President and Congress to take such action as necessary to require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to recognize valid easements existing pursuant to the 1866 Mining Act on federal lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-14Senateto House
2019-02-14SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-14SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-13SenateRetained on calendar
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback