ID SCR143 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CAMPAIGN FINANCE -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing a legislative study committee on campaign finance issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing a legislative study committee on campaign finance issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-15SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-14Houseto Senate
2018-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2018-03-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-07Senateto House
2018-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-07SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 34-0-1
2018-03-06SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback