ID SCR143 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring four Idaho servicemen who fought and lost their lives in Afghanistan within the past year.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring four Idaho servicemen who fought and lost their lives in Afghanistan within the past year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Andrus |
2014-03-20 | House | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | ADOPTED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-03-10 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-07 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read in full |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |