ID SCR142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Business
Pending: House Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Business
Pending: House Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DIVISION OF BUILDING SAFETY -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to Rules Governing Safety Inspections.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to Rules Governing Safety Inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/SCR142/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/SCR142.pdf |